Global Patent Index - EP 1020583 A1

EP 1020583 A1 2000-07-19 - Beam bottom, method for the production thereof and for the production of a beam therewith

Title (en)

Beam bottom, method for the production thereof and for the production of a beam therewith

Title (de)

Trägerboden, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung sowie zur Herstellung eines damit ausgerüsteten Trägers

Title (fr)

Fond de poutre, procédé pour sa fabrication ainsi que pour la fabrication d'une poutre le comprenant

Publication

EP 1020583 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00870002 A

Priority

BE 9900012 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a beam bottom, comprising a concrete slab (1) with main reinforcement bars (2) for said beam extending in the longitudinal direction therein, and with stirrups (3) extending in the transverse direction of the concrete slab (1) and intended for absorbing transverse forces in said beam, which stirrups (3) extend below said main reinforcement bars (2) and project to a predetermined height above the concrete slab (1). In addition, at least one lattice girder (4) is embedded in the concrete slab, which lattice girder likewise projects above the concrete slab, and on which said stirrups (3) rest. In particular, the stirrups (3) are suspended over the lattice girders (4). In this way the stirrups (3) can easily be retained in position during the pouring of the concrete slab (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

NL 1013565 A1 19991216; NL 1013565 C2 20000222; BE 1011014 A0 19990302; BE 1011014 B3 20010403; EP 1020583 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060215

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI