Global Patent Index - EP 1020584 A2

EP 1020584 A2 2000-07-19 - Building block

Title (en)

Building block

Title (de)

Stein, insbesondere Blockstein

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction

Publication

EP 1020584 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124014 A

Priority

DE 19901560 A

Abstract (en)

The brick, and especially a block brick, has a recess (3) at the outer wall (1) and/or inner wall (2) aligned at the other longitudinal wall (1,2). The recess is defined by the lower side or an upper side of the brick and the end sides. The recess (3) is filled with a material (4) which is hardened, and pref. liquid concrete. Structured projections (5) at the side of one brick fit into the shape of the recess (3) at the adjacent brick. The inner wall (2) has at least one blind drilling (13).

Abstract (de)

Ein Stein, insbesondere Blockstein, und ein Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung weist zwei Längswände, die eine Außenwand (1) und eine Innenwand (2) bilden, auf. Dabei ist die Außenwand (1) mit einem dämmenden und die Innenwand (2) mit einem betonartigen Werkstoff versehen. Die Außenwand (1) und/oder die Innenwand (2) weisen eine auf die jeweils andere Längswand (1,2) gerichtete Aussparung (3) auf, die an einer Steinunterseite (10) oder einer Steinoberseite (12) und den seitlichen Stirnseiten des Steines wenigstens teilweise von der jeweiligen Längswand (1,2) begrenzt ist. Die Aussparung (3) ist dabei mit einem aushärtenden Material (4) verfüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/40 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/40 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0206 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0228 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020584 A2 20000719; EP 1020584 A3 20011004; EP 1020584 B1 20050720; AT 299976 T 20050815; DE 19901560 A1 20000720

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEBHART, SIEGFRIED

- Effective date: 20051231

2006-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-09-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912299 P 20050825

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI LU

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 1/40 A, 7E 04C 1/41 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI LU

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI