Global Patent Index - EP 1020595 A1

EP 1020595 A1 2000-07-19 - Espagnolette fitting with a face-plate comprising an identification plate

Title (en)

Espagnolette fitting with a face-plate comprising an identification plate

Title (de)

Treibstangenbeschlag und Stulpschiene mit Kennzeichnungsschild

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage du type crémone comportant une têtière munie d'une plaque d'identificataion

Publication

EP 1020595 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440354 A

Priority

FR 9900542 A

Abstract (en)

The lock consists of at least one housing (2) attached to the back of a faceplate (3) and actuated by a control mechanism (4). The faceplate is designed to receive a clip-on identification plate (15) with a height and width no more than the dimensions of the faceplate. The identification plate, made e.g. from a synthetic material, is fitted to the faceplate by lugs (17, 17A) on its rear surface engaging in a force fit with matching holes (16, 16A) in the faceplate.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a trait à une ferrure de verrouillage du type serrure, crémone, crémone-serrure ou autre, comportant au moins un boîtier (2) rapporté à l'arrière d'une têtière (3) et accueillant un mécanisme de commande (4) quelconque. Cette ferrure de verrouillage est caractérisée par le fait que ladite têtière (3) comporte des moyens (13) de réception par clipage de moyens d'accrochage complémentaires (14) équipant une plaque signalétique et/ou d'identification (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05C 9/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020595 A1 20000719; EP 1020595 B1 20041124; DE 69922141 D1 20041230; DE 69922141 T2 20051117; ES 2229650 T3 20050416; FR 2788545 A1 20000721; FR 2788545 B1 20010309

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061211

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061211

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061210

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061210

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-11-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229650 T3

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050115

2004-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922141 P 20041230

2004-11-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI