Global Patent Index - EP 1020599 A2

EP 1020599 A2 2000-07-19 - Hinge assembly

Title (en)

Hinge assembly

Title (de)

Bandanordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de charnière

Publication

EP 1020599 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125695 A

Priority

DE 29900426 U

Abstract (en)

The fixed frame (1) and casement (4) are connected by hinge strips (30) swivelling about a hinge axis (A). A plate-like intermediate member (40) of variable thickness is fixed as compensating member between each fastening arm (14) and the associated fastening surface of the frame or casement. the intermediate members and the fastening arms have complementary interengaging projections and recesses on their facing sides

Abstract (de)

Die Bandanordnung ist für Türen, Fenster und dergleichen mit einem feststehenden Rahmen und einem Flügel bestimmt, die mittels Bändern (30,30',130) um eine Scharnierachse (A) schwenkbar miteinander verbunden sind,. Die Bänder umfassen jeweils einen an dem feststehenden Rahmen befestigten und einen am Flügel befestigten Bandteil (10,20), die jeweils um einen die Scharnierachse (A) bildenden Bandbolzen (12) schwenkbar aneinander gelagert sind. Mindestens eines der Bandteile ist mittels eines im wesentlichen senkrecht zur Rahmen- bzw. Flügelebene in den Spaltraum (8) zwischen dem feststehenden Rahmen und dem Flügel eingreifenden Befestigungsschenkels an dem feststehenden Rahmen oder dem Flügel befestigt. Zwischen dem jeweiligen Befestigungsschenkel (14) und der zugehörigen Befestigungsfläche des Rahmens oder Flügels ist ein plattenförmiges Zwischenstück (40,50) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/02 (2006.01); E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/023 (2013.01); E06B 2003/2639 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900426 U1 20000525; EP 1020599 A2 20000719; EP 1020599 A3 20031001

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060209

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040228

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI