Global Patent Index - EP 1020600 A2

EP 1020600 A2 2000-07-19 - Door leaf guide and associated door wing system, in particular for automatic sliding doors

Title (en)

Door leaf guide and associated door wing system, in particular for automatic sliding doors

Title (de)

Türblattführung sowie zugehörige Türflügelanordnung, insbesondere für automatische Schiebetüren

Title (fr)

Glissière de guidage d'un battant de porte et dispositif de vantail de porte associé, en particulier pour portes coulissantes automatiques

Publication

EP 1020600 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99126227 A

Priority

DE 19901188 A

Abstract (en)

The guide for a door-leaf consists of a U-shaped rail (41) which has a vertical guide-arm (47). The rail is anchored on the floor (7) by means of its horizontal section (66) and or by means of an anchoring-arm (48) staggered in position in relation to the vertical guide arm, and is anchored especially on a fixed side part (3) or its profiled plinth. The anchoring arm forming part of the guide rail, and or the holder-arm (63) forming part of a holder-rail (61) fits into a lengthwise cavity on the fixed side part or a bottom plinth profile (9').

Abstract (de)

Eine Türblattführung in Form einer im Querschnitt winkel- oder U-förmigen Türblattführungsschiene (41) weist eine Türblattführungsschiene (41) mit einem vertikalen Führungsschenkel (47) und einem horizontalen Schenkel (66) auf. Die Verbesserung ist dadurch gegeben, der Teil der Führungsschiene (41) bildende Verankerungsschenkel (48) und/oder ein Teil einer Halteschiene (61) bildende Halteschenkel (63; 63', 63''), der kraft- und/oder formschlüssig mit der Führungsschiene (41) verbindbar ist, in eine Längsausnehmung (A', B', C') am feststehenden Seitenteil (3) oder einem daran angebrachten unteren Sockelprofil (9') eingreift und darüber zumindest abgestützt und gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/0656 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/452 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/16 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4400940 C1 19950420 - TUERAUTOMATION FEHRALTORF AG F [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020600 A2 20000719; EP 1020600 A3 20020814; DE 19901188 A1 20000727; DE 19901188 C2 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-06-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI