Global Patent Index - EP 1020601 A2

EP 1020601 A2 2000-07-19 - Window or door fitting with at least two face plates

Title (en)

Window or door fitting with at least two face plates

Title (de)

Fenster- oder Türbeschlag mit wenigstens zwei Stulpschienen

Title (fr)

Ferrure pour fenêtre ou porte avec au moins deux têtières

Publication

EP 1020601 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125026 A

Priority

DE 19901709 A

Abstract (en)

The fitment has inverted rails (1, 2) set round the window or door casement and connected together at their adjoining longitudinal ends by connecting tabs (6). The connecting tab of the first rail and the area of the second rail overlapping this tab have on one side at least one connecting projection (11) and on the other side at least one connecting socket (16) through which the projection passes when the rails are in the useful position. The projection is elastically deformable and in the undeformed state is oversized relative to the socket so that its fits when elastically deformed into the socket perpendicular to the circumferential face (4) of the rebate

Abstract (de)

Im Falle eines Fenster- oder Türbeschlags mit wenigstens zwei an einer Falzumfangsfläche eines Fenster- (5) oder eines Türflügels angeordneten Stulpschienen (1, 2), welche an Längsenden einander benachbart und miteinander verbunden sind, ist an dem Längsende der ersten Stulpschiene (1) eine mit der zweiten Stulpschiene (2) in deren Längsrichtung überlappende Verbindungslasche (6) vorgesehen. Eine mit geringem Aufwand zu bewerkstelligende automatisierte Beschlagteilmontage wird dabei dadurch ermöglicht, daß an der Verbindungslasche (6) der ersten (1) und an dem mit der Verbindungslasche (6) überlappenden Bereich der zweiten Stulpschiene (2) einerseits wenigstens ein senkrecht zu der Falzumfangsfläche vorragender Verbindungsvorsprung (11, 11) und andererseits zumindest eine bei Gebrauchslage der Stulpschienen (1, 2) von dem Verbindungsvorsprung (11, 11) durchsetzte Verbindungsaufnahme (16) vorgesehen ist, wobei der Verbindungsvorsprung (11, 11) wenigstens in einem Teilbereich parallel zu der Falzumfangsfläche elastisch verformbar ist und in unverformtem Zustand ein Übermaß gegenüber der Verbindungsaufnahme (16) aufweist und wobei der Verbindungsvorsprung (11, 11) unter entsprechender elastischer Verformung in die Verbindungsaufnahme (16) senkrecht zu der Falzumfangsfläche einführbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/5208 (2013.01); E05C 9/004 (2013.01); E05C 9/22 (2013.01); E05C 9/24 (2013.01); E05D 15/52 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2925671 A1 19810115 - BILSTEIN AUGUST FA

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020601 A2 20000719; EP 1020601 A3 20040225; EP 1020601 B1 20080409; EP 1020601 B2 20140507; AT 391828 T 20080415; DE 19901709 A1 20000810; DE 19901709 B4 20040624; DE 59914721 D1 20080521

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-12 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 59914721

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-05-15 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: AELC

2014-05-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20140507

2014-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2014-05-07 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R102

- Ref Document Number: 59914721

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111215

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101230

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-AUBI KG

- Effective date: 20090108

2009-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM UND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP

2008-05-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914721

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-05-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI