Global Patent Index - EP 1020612 A2

EP 1020612 A2 2000-07-19 - Headrail and control system for powered coverings for architectural openings

Title (en)

Headrail and control system for powered coverings for architectural openings

Title (de)

Kopfschiene und Steuerungssystem für mit Motorantrieb versehene Abdeckungen von Gebäudeöffnungen

Title (fr)

Rail de tête et système de commande pour couvertures à moteur pour ouvertures de bâtiment

Publication

EP 1020612 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300138 A

Priority

US 11539399 P

Abstract (en)

A headrail designed for powered coverings for architectural openings comprises a housing defining an interior that conveniently hides a battery holder, a signal-receiving system, and an electric motor used to adjust the configuration of the covering. The headrail also hides improved hardware for mounting the motor and, in the case of coverings comprising tiltable elements, improved hardware for mounting a tilt rod. Additionally, in the case of coverings comprising tiltable elements, the headrail hides improved hardware for adjustably attaching the tiltable elements to the tilt rod in a manner that prevents over-rotation of the tiltable elements. The battery holder may comprise a battery magazine or a battery carrier removably mounted in the headrail housing. The batteries may be inserted into or extracted from the battery holder through an opening in a bottom wall of the headrail housing. A swingably mounted trap door may selectively cover or uncover the opening. The battery carrier slidingly engages, through the opening in the bottom of the headrail housing, a battery carrier housing that is mounted within the headrail housing. The signal-receiving system includes an exposed signal receiver for receipt of remote-control signals. The present invention also provides a tilt control system with an inexpensive and effective clutch to prevent over-winding of cords onto a control shaft (e.g., a tilt rod) used to control tiltable elements of the covering. The preferred tilt control system also minimizes torque on the motor or other mechanism used to drive the control shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/32 (2006.01); E06B 9/323 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/32 (2013.01); E06B 9/323 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020612 A2 20000719; EP 1020612 A3 20020109; AU 1003600 A 20000713; CA 2295327 A1 20000711; CA 2295327 C 20080520

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 9/30 A, 7E 06B 9/32 B, 7E 06B 9/307 B, 7E 06B 9/308 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI