Global Patent Index - EP 1020613 A2

EP 1020613 A2 2000-07-19 - Housing for a drive unit actuating Venetian blinds or the like

Title (en)

Housing for a drive unit actuating Venetian blinds or the like

Title (de)

Gehäuse einer zur Bewegung von Jalousien oder dergleichen vorgesehenen Antriebseinheit

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour une unité d'entraînement de commande de stores vénitiens ou similaires

Publication

EP 1020613 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100219 A

Priority

DE 19901559 A

Abstract (en)

The housing (10) is contained in a top rail of the blind and is formed by a metal or plastic hollow profile (11)of variable length which is slid longitudinally into the top rail where it is held. The profiled outer shape of the hollow profile matches the inner shape of the top rail. The side walls (13-16)of the hollow profile have at least one recess for attaching a drive component. The recess is formed by a groove (22-25) extending in the hollow profile's lengthwise direction. The inner surface of the hollow profile has lengthwise-extending ridges (26-29).

Abstract (de)

Ein Gehäuse (10) einer zur Bewegung von Jalousien oder dergleichen vorgesehenen Antriebseinheit setzt sich aus mechanischen, elektrischen und elektronischen Antriebskomponenten zusammen. Das Gehäuse (10) ist in einer Kopfschiene der Jalousie befestigbar. Das Gehäuse (10) ist durch ein Hohlprofil (11) variabler Länge ausgebildet, das in die Kopfschiene in Längsrichtung (12) der Kopfschiene einschiebbar und in der Kopfschiene formschlüssig gehalten ist. Es wurde ein Gehäuse (10) entwickelt, das möglichst einfach aufgebaut ist und auf leicht handhabbare Art und Weise in einer Kopfschiene einer Jalousie eingebaut werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/323

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/323 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2160820 B1 19730510 - HUEPPE JUSTIN [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020613 A2 20000719; EP 1020613 A3 20021023; DE 19901559 A1 20000803; DE 19901559 B4 20040715

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20031115

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROSS, BEATRIX

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-07-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030419

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI