Global Patent Index - EP 1020614 A1

EP 1020614 A1 2000-07-19 - Multipurpose ladder with folding ladder stiles

Title (en)

Multipurpose ladder with folding ladder stiles

Title (de)

Mehrzweckleiter mit zusammenklappbaren Holmen

Title (fr)

Echelle à usages multiples à montants pliants

Publication

EP 1020614 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100517 A

Priority

DE 19901126 A

Abstract (en)

The ladder has several sections with each two adjoining sections (2.1 to 2.4) connected to swivel about articulated joints (5,6,7). In the middle of the longitudinal extension of the stiles (2,3) there are first articulated joints (5,15) which can take up more strain in the torque direction than the second joints (6,7) which are provided closer to the ends of the stiles. A mechanically unlockable blocking member is used to lock the joints. The blocking members can be blocking wedges which fit into recesses.

Abstract (de)

Eine Mehrzweckleiter (1) besteht aus zusammenklappbaren Holmen (2, 3), bei der jeder Holm (2, 3) mehrere Holmabschnitte (2.1, 2.2, 2.3, 2.4, 3.1, 3.2, 3.3, 3.4) umfaßt. Jeweils zwei benachbarte Holmabschnitte sind mittels eines Gelenks (5, 6, 7, 15, 16, 17) miteinander verbunden und um eine Gelenkachse (20) schwenkbar. Die Gelenke (5, 6, 7, 15, 16, 17) sind in mindestens einer vorbestimmten Winkelposition des Schwenkbereichs der Holmabschnitte (2.1, 2.2, 2.3, 2.4, 3.1, 3.2, 3.3, 3.4) arretierbar. Im mittleren Bereich der Längserstreckung der Holme (2, 3) der Mehrzweckleiter (1) sind erste Gelenke (5, 15) angeordnet, deren Belastbarkeit in Drehmomentrichtung größer ist als die von zweiten Gelenken (6, 7, 16, 17), die näher an den Enden der Holme (2, 3) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 1/39; E06C 1/32; F16C 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/32 (2006.01); E06C 1/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/32 (2013.01); E06C 1/39 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3211164 C2 19850620

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020614 A1 20000719; DE 19901126 A1 20000720

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020801

2001-04-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI