Global Patent Index - EP 1020643 A3

EP 1020643 A3 2000-12-27 - Pressure safety block for high pressure cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Pressure safety block for high pressure cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Regelsicherheitsblock für Hochdruck-Reinigungsgeräten

Title (fr)

Bloc de sûreté de pression pour un nettoyeur à haute pression

Publication

EP 1020643 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125456 A

Priority

DE 29900463 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020643A2] In a hole of the control device between suction and pressure side of the high pressure pump a changeover valve is fitted, which when a specific pre-set pressure is exceeded causes a feedback of at least one part of the cleaning medium activated by high pressure to the suction conduit of the high pressure pump. The regulating unit (2) has at least two component parts with proportional characteristic values for pressure regulation. At least one switch unit for pressure-dependent temperature regulation of the cleaning medium is so arranged with at least one switch position along a displaceably arranged axis so that at least one switch arm reaches as far as the corresponding switch mechanism in order to operate it. The regulating component parts are formed as springs (33,35) with proportional spring constants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/035 (2006.01); F04B 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900463 U1 20000224; DE 59910124 D1 20040909; DK 1020643 T3 20041206; EP 1020643 A2 20000719; EP 1020643 A3 20001227; EP 1020643 B1 20040804; NO 20000073 A 20000717; NO 20000073 D0 20000107

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-03-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-12-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910124 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040804

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK GB

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010526

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI