Global Patent Index - EP 1020649 A3

EP 1020649 A3 2001-03-14 - Element for connecting furniture parts

Title (en)

Element for connecting furniture parts

Title (de)

Element zum Verbinden von Möbelteilen

Title (fr)

Elément d'assemblage pour éléments de meuble

Publication

EP 1020649 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99811197 A

Priority

DE 19859359 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19859359A1] The connector part (1,a) has a central passage (3) for a long connector plug (20) and longitudinal grooves (4,5) on the side and parallel to the bore, to act as fasteners. The grooves are plugged over longitudinal edges (13,16) of a furniture part. The connector is central-symmetrical and the grooves enclose an acute angle. One of the grooves has a pocket hole (7) in the base to accommodate a dowel (12). The connector is a round bar, and is of timber, or of metal, esp. aluminum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 12/02; A47B 47/00; F16B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19859359 A1 20000629; EP 1020649 A2 20000719; EP 1020649 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010915

2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 16B 12/02 A, 7F 16B 5/00 B, 7A 47B 47/00 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI