Global Patent Index - EP 1020681 A2

EP 1020681 A2 2000-07-19 - Spotlight with variable illumination output angle and with an aspherical front lens

Title (en)

Spotlight with variable illumination output angle and with an aspherical front lens

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer mit veränderlichem Abstrahlwinkel und mit asphärischer Frontlinse

Title (fr)

Projecteur à angle d'émission de lumière variable à lentille antérieure asphérique

Publication

EP 1020681 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124750 A

Priority

DE 19901391 A

Abstract (en)

The spotlight has a variable radiation angle achieved other than by shading the beam path with stops or masks, a light source (4) inside the spotlight and a first lens (2) forming the front lens of the spotlight. The first lens is an aspherical lens that is grained on at least one surface and is rotation symmetrical wrt. its optical axis.

Abstract (de)

Ein Scheinwerfer hat einen veränderlichen Abstrahlwinkel, dessen Veränderung anders als durch Abschattung des Strahlenganges mittels Blende oder Maske hervorgerufen wird. Der Scheinwerfer weist eine im Scheinwerferinneren angeordnete Lichtquelle (4) und eine erste Linse (2), die als Frontlinse ausgebildet ist, auf. Die erste Linse (2) ist eine asphärische Linse. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2006.01); F21S 10/00 (2006.01); F21V 5/04 (2006.01); F21V 14/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/048 (2013.01); F21S 10/00 (2013.01); F21V 14/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020681 A2 20000719; EP 1020681 A3 20011010; EP 1020681 B1 20070530; CN 1122773 C 20031001; CN 1261136 A 20000726; DE 19901391 A1 20000914; DE 59914358 D1 20070712; US 6499862 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161108

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080303

2007-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914358

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-07-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 2/00 20060101AFI20061207BHEP

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 10/00 20060101ALI20061207BHEP

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 14/06 20060101ALI20061207BHEP

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 5/04 20060101ALI20061207BHEP

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI