Global Patent Index - EP 1020684 A1

EP 1020684 A1 2000-07-19 - Inner pipe for a chimney

Title (en)

Inner pipe for a chimney

Title (de)

Innenrohr für einen Schornstein

Title (fr)

Tube intérieur pour cheminée

Publication

EP 1020684 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99100582 A

Priority

EP 99100582 A

Abstract (en)

One end of the inner pipe (10) is in the form of a sleeve (12) whose inner diameter at least equals the external diameter of the inner pipe at its free end. The sleeve has a funnel-shaped cap (18) whose internal diameter is at most equal to the sleeve's inner diameter and at least equal to the external diameter of the free end (14) of the inner pipe. The funnel shaped surface of the cap is truncated-cone shaped and is in the form of a thin-walled, sheet metal tube (20) which has an inward pointing bead (22) above the cap. The sleeve is enclosed by a collar (24) near which is an inward-pointing clamping strips (26). Elastic centering elements (28) are distributed over the cap's periphery and held in holders (32) in an extended section (30) of the tube.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Innenrohr (10) für einen Schornstein, wobei das eine Ende des Innenrohrs (10) als Muffe (12) ausgebildet ist, deren Innendurchmesser mindestens gleich dem Außendurchmesser des Innenrohres (10) an seinem freien Ende ist. Um die Muffe (12) möglichst dünnwandig auszubilden und bei der Montage des Innenrohrsystems Beschädigungen der Rohrenden beim Aufsetzen des nächstfolgenden Innenrohres (10) zu vermeiden, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Muffe (12) einen trichterförmigen Aufsatz (18) aufweist, dessen Innendurchmesser maximal gleich dem Innendurchmesser der Muffe (12) und minimal gleich dem Außendurchmesser des freien Endes (14) des Innenrohres (10) ist. Vorzugsweise ist der trichterförmige Aufsatz (18) als dünnwandiger Stutzen (20) aus Metall ausgeführt und weist oberhalb der Muffe (12) eine nach innen weisende Sicke (22) sowie eine die Muffe (12) umgebende Manschette (24) auf. Am trichterförmigen Aufsatz (18) können über den Umfang verteilte elastisch federnde Zentrierelemente (28) vorgesehen sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/04 (2013.01); F23J 2213/202 (2013.01); F23J 2213/204 (2013.01); F23J 2213/304 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0711954 A2 19960515 - ERLUS BAUSTOFFWERKE [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020684 A1 20000719; EP 1020684 B1 20041020; AT 280357 T 20041115; CZ 20012579 A3 20020313; CZ 296887 B6 20060712; DE 59910897 D1 20041125; HR P20010500 A2 20020831; HU 0105147 A2 20020429; HU 0105147 A3 20020628; HU 224117 B1 20050530; PL 194078 B1 20070430; PL 350049 A1 20021021; SI 1020684 T1 20050228; SK 285877 B6 20071004; SK 9792001 A3 20020205; WO 0042358 A1 20000720

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20090827

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090114

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910897 P 20041125

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2004-10-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-06-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PFEFFER, GERHARD

2004-06-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: POPELYSZYN, ELMAR

2004-06-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNTEREGGER, FLORIAN

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030808

2001-04-18 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001227

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI