Global patent index - EP 1020691 A1

EP 1020691 A1 2000-07-19 - Capillary and suction tube system for evaporator systems, in particular cold cycle systems

Title (en)

Capillary and suction tube system for evaporator systems, in particular cold cycle systems

Title (de)

Kapillar-Saugrohrsystem für Verdampfer-Systeme bzw. Kältekreislaufsysteme

Title (fr)

Système de tube capillaire et d'aspiration pour systèmes évaporatifs, en particulier systèmes de cycle froid

Publication

EP 1020691 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124504 A

Priority

DE 19900701 A

Abstract (en)

The system has at least one suction tube (1) and at least one capillary tube (2), whereby at least the suction tube consists of a multi-profile tube with a chamber-like cross-section. Both tubes can be formed by a multi-profile tube with a chamber-like cross-section.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Kapillar-Saugrohreinrichtung für Verdampfersysteme und Kältekreislaufsysteme mit mindestens einem Saugrohr (1) und mindestens einem Kapillarrohr (2), wobei zumindest das Saugrohr aus einem im Querschnitt kammerartige Multi-Profilrohre (6,7,8,9) beinhaltenden Element gebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/067 (2013.01); F25B 2400/052 (2013.01); F25B 2400/054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900701 A1 20000713; EP 1020691 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EVIDAL SCHMOELE GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010115

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI