Global Patent Index - EP 1020699 A1

EP 1020699 A1 2000-07-19 - Missile

Title (en)

Missile

Title (de)

Flugkörper

Title (fr)

Missile

Publication

EP 1020699 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124091 A

Priority

DE 19857894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19857894A1] The airborne guided missile is coupled to the launch aircraft by a data link and a starter unit. The missile has an electronic system that consists of hardware and software and has function monitoring, error detection and allows reconfiguration to be made. The monitoring system is model based and includes redundancy functions.

Abstract (de)

Zur Erhöhung der Verfügbarkeit eines Flugkörpers (10) sind funktionswichtige Elemente des Flugkörpers (10) redundandant vorgesehen. Der Flugkörper (10) weist Mittel (80) zur Funktionsüberwachung, Fehlerdetektion und -lokalisierung und Rekonfiguration dieser Elemente auf. Es werden verschiedene Ausführungen solcher Mittel unter Benutzung wissensbasierter und lernfähiger Strukturen beschrieben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41F 3/055 (2013.01); F41G 7/2246 (2013.01); F42B 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857894 A1 20000621; DE 59913732 D1 20060914; EP 1020699 A1 20000719; EP 1020699 B1 20060802

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101213

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101213

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913732

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101214

2011-09-13 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101213

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913732 P 20060914

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000415

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI