Global Patent Index - EP 1020771 A2

EP 1020771 A2 2000-07-19 - Recyclable image-recording material

Title (en)

Recyclable image-recording material

Title (de)

Wiederverwendbares Bildaufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau recyclable pour l'enregistrement d'images

Publication

EP 1020771 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100587 A

Priority

JP 634299 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a recyclable recording medium comprising; a base member, a surface layer comprising a water-swelling resin, and having a thickness of 3 to 30 mu m; a saturated swelling amount in the direction of thickness is 4 to 25 mu m when the recyclable recording medium is immersed in an aqueous medium. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 7/00; B41M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 7/02 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); G03G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/0026 (2013.01); B41M 7/0009 (2013.01); G03G 7/00 (2013.01); G03G 7/0006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020771 A2 20000719; EP 1020771 A3 20030423; JP 2000202935 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070323

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050608

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI