Global Patent Index - EP 1020784 A2

EP 1020784 A2 2000-07-19 - A comfort controls system

Title (en)

A comfort controls system

Title (de)

Komfortsteuerungssystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande du confort

Publication

EP 1020784 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300235 A

Priority

  • GB 9900742 A
  • GB 9900739 A

Abstract (en)

A domestic heating system 20 serving a space-heating circuit 2 and a domestic hot waster circuit 4 has: a base unit 21 which is located next to boiler 7 and which monitors and controls operations of the system 20; a room unit 22 located in a room containing radiator 3 of the space-heating circuit 2; a mid-position valve 23; a cylinder sensor 24 and a frost kit 25. Base unit 21 has a microprocessor-run communications and control function to process appropriate information from the elements of system 20 and to ensure suitable operation of those elements at all times. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 23/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020784 A2 20000719; EP 1020784 A3 20010530; GB 0000800 D0 20000308; GB 2345749 A 20000719; GB 2345749 B 20010926

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040928

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 05D 23/19 A, 7F 24D 19/10 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI