Global patent index - EP 1020822 A1

EP 1020822 A1 2000-07-19 - Control apparatus for vending machine

Title (en)

Control apparatus for vending machine

Title (de)

Steuereinrichtung für einen Verkaufsautomaten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle pour distributeur automatique

Publication

EP 1020822 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99100567 A

Priority

EP 99100567 A

Abstract (en)

A control apparatus for vending machine (1) is provided which facilitates resetting of control data with reduced costs by means of a commonly used remote terminal (10) and a public telecommunication network. The control data stored in a memory in the control unit (2) are converted to data information in a form, such as HTML, compatible with a public telecommunication network (e.g., Internet), transmitted through the line to a remote terminal (10) and renewed therein. The renewed data are transmitted again through a public telecommunication network in a form, such as HTTP, compatible with the telecommunication network toward the control unit (2), in which the data stored in the memory are renewed according to the renewed data transmitted from the remote terminal (10). A control apparatus for vending machine (1) is also provided which facilitates collection of sales data and maintenance data with reduced costs by means of a commonly used remote terminal (10) and a public telecommunication network. Data stored in a memory in the control unit are converted to data information in HTML form and transmitted through Internet to a remote terminal (10), whereby the received data are displayed in a display (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/02; G07F 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 5/18 (2006.01); G07F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/002 (2013.01); G07F 5/18 (2013.01); G07F 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H08161599 A 19960621 - SANYO ELECTRIC CO

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020822 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI