Global Patent Index - EP 1020823 A3

EP 1020823 A3 2001-05-30 - Vending apparatus carrying out a commodity control in accordance with a selling term determined for each of commodities

Title (en)

Vending apparatus carrying out a commodity control in accordance with a selling term determined for each of commodities

Title (de)

Verkaufsautomat zur Durchführung einer Warenkontrolle in Übereinstimmung mit einem für jeden Artikel ermittelten Verkaufszeitraum

Title (fr)

Machine de vente réalisant un contrôle des articles suivant un terme de vente déterminé pour chaque article

Publication

EP 1020823 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309777 A

Priority

JP 35043498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020823A2] In a vending apparatus fixedly installed in a store for vending commodities, a control section controls the commodities in accordance with a selling term determined for each of the commodities. These commodities are stored in a storing section (10) placed at a first position in the store. A designated one of the commodities is carried by a carrying mechanism (40) from the storing section to a take-out section (31) placed at a second position in the store. It is preferable that the control section makes the carrying mechanism carry a term-expired one of the commodities from the storing section to a disposal section (33) placed at a third position in the store. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/02; G07F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020823 A2 20000719; EP 1020823 A3 20010530; JP 2000172923 A 20000623

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 9/02 A, 7G 07F 11/00 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI