Global patent index - EP 1020836 A3

EP 1020836 A3 2000-10-11 - Improvements in electric signs

Title (en)

Improvements in electric signs

Title (de)

Verbessertes elektrisches Zeichen

Title (fr)

Enseigne éléctrique ameliorée

Publication

EP 1020836 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00500002 A

Priority

ES 9900061 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020836A2] Improvements are disclosed in electric signs comprising a lower door which allows accessing the interior of the sign and maintenance operations, allowing a single worker without specific skills to easily carry out such tasks. The improvements also consist in incorporating a set of rollers on which rests the polycarbonate bearing the publicity or informative lettering which allow lateral sliding of the polycarbonate as it expands or contracts with the ambient temperature allowing to use polycarbonate sheets of any length. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020836 A2 20000719; EP 1020836 A3 20001011; ES 2152174 A1 20010116; ES 2152174 B1 20010816

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020801

2003-04-02 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS (R. 69 (1) EPC) DATED 06.09.2002 PRIMANOS S.L. MATILDE HERNANDEZ 31, 2C 28019 MADRID ESPAGNE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI