Global Patent Index - EP 1020844 A2

EP 1020844 A2 2000-07-19 - Whistle

Title (en)

Whistle

Title (de)

Pfeife

Title (fr)

Sifflet

Publication

EP 1020844 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00300273 A

Priority

GB 9900868 A

Abstract (en)

A whistle (1), particularly a sports whistle, which is generally in the shape of a mandolin and has two whistle element sound chambers (2,3) arranged side-by-side and each having a cross section which is asymmetrical, preferably part-circular and part square. The sound chambers (2,3) are arranged so that the blowing pressure required to generate a sound pressure level of 90DbA and a maximum frequency of about 3.9KHz is only 0.5 p.s.i. The sound chambers (2,3) are separated from one another at each air vent (4,5) by a fin (F) of generally narrow width, and the entrance to each sound chamber is defined in part by a respective inclined inner wall (10,11) near the central longitudinal axis of the whistle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020844 A2 20000719; EP 1020844 A3 20040428

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071013

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070402

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20041025

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI