Global Patent Index - EP 1020875 A3

EP 1020875 A3 2001-04-18 - Emi filtering of multi-wire cables

Title (en)

Emi filtering of multi-wire cables

Title (de)

EMI - Filtrieren bei Mehrdrahtkabeln

Title (fr)

Filtration EMI de câbles multiconducteurs

Publication

EP 1020875 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99123557 A

Priority

AU PP814899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020875A2] A multiple-wire cable such as a cable connecting a PABX which generates unwanted EMI signals to other equipment acts to radiate EMI and to conduct EMI signals to other equipment. It is known to apply individual line filters to each line to prevent the EMI signals from being distributed over the cable. According to the invention EMI signals, both radiated and conducted are attenuated by a distributed filter in the form of a screen applied to the cable. To effectively attenuate the conducted signals, the length of the screened cable must be greater than a minimum length determined for the frequency of the EMI and the dimensions of the cable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/06; H04Q 1/10; H05K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 3/02 (2006.01); H01B 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020875 A2 20000719; EP 1020875 A3 20010418; AU PP814899 D0 19990204; JP 2000232396 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01B 11/06 A, 7H 05K 9/00 B, 7H 04Q 1/10 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI