Global Patent Index - EP 1020882 A1

EP 1020882 A1 2000-07-19 - Arc extinguishing chamber with composite material walls, and switchgear having such a chamber

Title (en)

Arc extinguishing chamber with composite material walls, and switchgear having such a chamber

Title (de)

Lichtbogenlöschkammer mit Wänden aus Verbundstoff, und mit solcher Kammer versehenes Schaltgerät

Title (fr)

Chambre d'extinction d'arc dont les parois latérales sont en matériau composite, et appareillage de coupure comportant une telle chambre

Publication

EP 1020882 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410175 A

Priority

FR 9900344 A

Abstract (en)

The chamber, designed to extinguish an arc produced by the separation of contacts, has two side walls (52) with a composite structure of at least two layers, and a series of spaced plates (50) between them. At least one of the layers is of impregnated polyamide fabric with fire-resistant additives.

Abstract (fr)

Une chambre d'extinction d'arc électrique 26 destinée à être placée en regard d'organes de contact séparables 28, 32 d'un appareillage de coupure et à éteindre l'arc généré par la séparation desdits contacts, comporte deux parois latérales 52 en regard l'une de l'autre et une pluralité de plaques espacées 50, disposées entre les parois latérales et maintenues par celles-ci. Les parois latérales 52 ont une structure composite stratifiée à au moins deux couches. Les couches comportent un tissu polyamide imprégné de résine thermodurcissable. La chambre ainsi obtenue a des propriétés avantageuses de tenue à la coupure. Les arêtes 70 des parois latérales 52 ne présentent pas de point de faiblesse diélectrique. La chambre 26 est particulièrement adaptée à des appareillages basse tension de puissance de calibre élevés. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/34 (2006.01); H01H 73/06 (2006.01); H01H 73/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/34 (2013.01); H01H 9/346 (2013.01); H01H 9/342 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020882 A1 20000719; EP 1020882 B1 20060524; DE 69931457 D1 20060629; DE 69931457 T2 20061116; FR 2788372 A1 20000713; FR 2788372 B1 20010223; JP 2000207980 A 20000728; JP 4312327 B2 20090812; US 6218636 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2006-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060705

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931457 P 20060629

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI