Global Patent Index - EP 1020945 A1

EP 1020945 A1 2000-07-19 - Adjustable attenuator

Title (en)

Adjustable attenuator

Title (de)

Abgleichbares Dämpfungsglied

Title (fr)

Atténuateur ajustable

Publication

EP 1020945 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124973 A

Priority

DE 19900624 A

Abstract (en)

The damping element consists of a planar line (1) with damping material arranged adjacent to it. The width (w) of the line is reduced in a section of length (L) about half the operating wavelength of the damping element. A coating of damping material (2,3) is applied to this section on at least one side and the desired damping can be set by varying the width of the coating using a laser.

Abstract (de)

Ein auf einfache Weise abgleichbares Dämpfungsglied besteht aus einer planaren Leitung (1), deren Breite (w) in einem Abschnitt mit einer Länge (L) von ca. der halben Betriebswellenlänge des Dämpfungsgliedes verringert ist. In diesem Abschnitt ist mindestens an einer Seite neben der Leitung (1) eine Schicht (2, 3) eines Dämpfungsmaterials aufgebracht. Eine gewünschte Dämpfung ist durch Verändern der Breite (b) der Dämpfungsmaterialschicht (2, 3) einstellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4349792 A 19820914 - SCHEINER HARRY
  • [A] EP 0169694 A2 19860129 - RCA CORP [US]
  • [A] GB 1456370 A 19761124 - DECCA LTD
  • [A] J.P. PHILLIPS: "VARIABLE ATTENUATOR FOR MICROSTRIP", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 3, no. 1, March 1983 (1983-03-01), MOTOROLA INC. SCHAUMBURG, ILLINOIS., US, pages 25 - 26, XP002134731
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 509 (E - 1610) 26 September 1994 (1994-09-26)
  • [A] A.D. ARFIN ET AL.: "SHRINKING ATTENUATORS FOR MIC AND STRIPLINE APPLICATIONS", MICROWAVE JOURNAL., vol. 20, no. 5, May 1977 (1977-05-01), HORIZON HOUSE. DEDHAM., US, pages 51 - 52, XP002134732, ISSN: 0192-6225

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900624 C1 20000706; BR 0000037 A 20000926; EP 1020945 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050701

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI