Global patent index - EP 1020946 A1

EP 1020946 A1 2000-07-19 - Cavity resonator with tuning means for its resonance frequency

Title (en)

Cavity resonator with tuning means for its resonance frequency

Title (de)

Hohlraumresonator mit Mitteln zur Abstimmung seiner Resonanzfrequenz

Title (fr)

Cavité résonante et moyens d' ajustement de sa fréquence de résonance

Publication

EP 1020946 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124266 A

Priority

DE 19901265 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19901265C1] The resonator has one or more depressions or protrusions (7) in the surface of the hollow chamber walls (1,2). The walls are made of one or more sheets. One or more impressions or protrusions are formed in each of two opposing walls of a rectangular hollow chamber, at positions of maximum electrical field.

Abstract (de)

Ein Hohlraumresonator ist mit einfachen Mitteln auf eine Vielzahl von Frequenzkanälen dadurch abstimmbar, daß in die Hohlraumwandung (1, 2) ein oder mehrere in das Innere des Hohlraumresonators gerichtete Eindellungen und/oder nach außen gerichtete Ausdellungen (7) geprägt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19901265 C1 20000608; BR 0000065 A 20001205; EP 1020946 A1 20000719

INPADOC legal status

2006-01-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050701

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI