Global Patent Index - EP 1020955 A1

EP 1020955 A1 2000-07-19 - Coaxial connector element to be mounted to a coaxial cable end

Title (en)

Coaxial connector element to be mounted to a coaxial cable end

Title (de)

Koaxial-Steckverbinderelement zum Einbau auf das Ende eines Koaxialkabels

Title (fr)

Elément de connecteur coaxial destiné à être monté à l'extrémité d'un câble coaxial

Publication

EP 1020955 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400095 A

Priority

FR 9900387 A

Abstract (en)

Connector has central contact (5) and metallic section (1) earthing connector and having part electrically attached to external conductor (9) of cable and composed of two tongues (7). Tongues are linked at bases, circle external conductor and are attached to each other at other ends (14, 16).

Abstract (fr)

Elément de connecteur coaxial destiné à être monté à l'extrémité d'un câble coaxial comportant un conducteur central et un conducteur externe, ledit élément de connecteur comprenant un contact central (5) et un corps métallique (1) servant de contact de masse et ayant une partie à relier électriquement au conducteur externe du câble. La partie du corps métallique à relier électriquement au conducteur externe du câble comporte deux languettes (7) ayant chacune une base (7a) et une extrémité libre (7b), les deux languettes étant réunies à leurs bases, s'étendant à l'opposé l'une de l'autre et étant aptes à s'enrouler autour du conducteur externe pour se rejoindre à leurs extrémités libres, lesquelles extrémités libres sont conformées de manière à s'accrocher l'une à l'autre pour maintenir lesdites languettes enroulées autour du conducteur externe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/0518 (2013.01); H01R 4/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020955 A1 20000719; DE 1020955 T1 20010607; FR 2788632 A1 20000721; FR 2788632 B1 20010309

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070801

2001-06-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-02-21 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI