Global patent index - EP 1020959 A2

EP 1020959 A2 2000-07-19 - Connecting system

Title (en)

Connecting system

Title (de)

Verbindungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de connexion

Publication

EP 1020959 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100584 A

Priority

DE 19901734 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a housing (1) for attachment to a bearer with a number of holders (2) and associated module inserts (3) for accommodating plug contacts, latching arrangements (7,9) for latching the module inserts in the holders with at least one sprung latching hook (7) and at least one associated latching surface (9) and a cover (17) for the plug contacts. The cover has stop surfaces (18) that engage behind the latching hooks with the module inserts latched in and block them against bending up.

Abstract (de)

Verbindungssystem, insbesondere zur Verbindung von Steckermodulen an Kraftfahrzeugsitzen, mit einem an einem Träger befestigbaren Gehäuse (1), welches eine Mehrzahl von Aufnahmen (2) aufweist, den Aufnahmen (2) zugeordneten Moduleinsätzen (3) zur Aufnahme von Steckerkontakten, Einrastmitteln (7, 9) zur Verrastung der Moduleinsätze (3) in den Aufnahmen (2) mit mindestens einem federnd aufbiegbaren Rasthaken (7) und mindestens einer zugeordneten Einrastfläche (9), und einem Deckel (17) zur Abdeckung der Steckerkontakte, wobei zur Verbesserung der Funktion der Deckel (17) mit Anschlagflächen (18) versehen ist, welche die Rasthaken (7) bei eingerasteten Moduleinsätzen (3) hintergreifen und gegen ein Aufbiegen blockieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/518; H01R 13/506; H01R 13/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/506 (2006.01); H01R 13/514 (2006.01); H01R 13/518 (2006.01); H01R 13/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/518 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01); H01R 13/514 (2013.01); H01R 13/64 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020959 A2 20000719; EP 1020959 A3 20001227; EP 1020959 B1 20050330; DE 19901734 A1 20000720

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110112

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50009887

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060102

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-07-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009887

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021202

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/518 A, 7H 01R 13/506 B, 7H 01R 13/514 B, 7H 01R 13/645 B, 7H 01R 13/627 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI