Global Patent Index - EP 1020964 A1

EP 1020964 A1 2000-07-19 - Connector for terminating communication cables

Title (en)

Connector for terminating communication cables

Title (de)

Verbinder zum Abschliessen von Fernmeldekabeln

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour terminer des câbles de communication

Publication

EP 1020964 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99100687 A

Priority

EP 99100687 A

Abstract (en)

A connector for terminating at least one pair of wires, the connector comprising a housing (104, 104') and at least one pair (A, B) of contacts (106, 108, 106', 108') mounted in the housing, each contact having an insulation displacing contact (IDC) blade portion (107, 107') arranged in a row along the housing, wherein each contact (106', 108') further comprises a capacitive coupling portion (200, 200') overlapping the respective other contact of the same pair (A, B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/58 (2011.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2429 (2013.01); H01R 4/2433 (2013.01); H01R 4/2441 (2013.01); H01R 13/6464 (2013.01); H01R 13/6474 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020964 A1 20000719; EP 1020964 B1 20051012; AT 306727 T 20051015; DE 69927662 D1 20051117; DE 69927662 T2 20060720

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-10-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Document: CH 1020964

2006-03-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060313

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-01-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-01-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060112

2006-01-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060112

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927662 P 20051117

2005-11-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-10-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-10-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-10-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-10-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-10-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040727

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI