Global Patent Index - EP 1020966 A1

EP 1020966 A1 2000-07-19 - System for inserting pins in devices like connectors

Title (en)

System for inserting pins in devices like connectors

Title (de)

System zum einbringen von stiften in vorrichtungen wie zum biespiel einen verbinder

Title (fr)

Système pour implanter des broches dans un dispositif tel que, par example, un connecteur.

Publication

EP 1020966 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400002 A

Priority

FR 9900320 A

Abstract (en)

Implantation system (1) has step-by-step advance and guiding unit (2) of continuous wire (F) and implantation unit (3) of wire sections in connector. Units can move relatively to each other so that they can move from first position, where continuous wire is introduced into implantation unit through advance and guiding unit, to second position where pin can be implanted, and vice versa.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un système pour implanter, dans un dispositif tel que notamment un connecteur, des broches formées par des tronçons d'un fil continu et séparables au niveau de zones frangibles les reliant les uns à la suite des autres. Avantageusement, le système est remarquable : en ce qu'il comporte : une unité d'avance pas à pas et de guidage (2) dudit fil continu, et une unité d'implantation (3) desdits tronçons de fil dans ledit dispositif ; et en ce que lesdites unités (2, 3) sont montées mobiles l'une par rapport à l'autre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/20; H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 19/12 (2006.01); H01R 43/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/20 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49139 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49153 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5142 (2013.01); Y10T 29/5193 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53174 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020966 A1 20000719; EP 1020966 B1 20020828; DE 60000353 D1 20021002; DE 60000353 T2 20030515; FR 2788634 A1 20000721; FR 2788634 B1 20010223; US 6393689 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100103

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100103

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100103

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60000353

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI