Global Patent Index - EP 1020997 A2

EP 1020997 A2 2000-07-19 - Method for processing and apparatus for encoding audio or video frame data

Title (en)

Method for processing and apparatus for encoding audio or video frame data

Title (de)

Verarbeitungsverfahren und Kodiervorrichtung für Audio- oder Videorahmendaten

Title (fr)

Méthode de traitement et appareil de codage pour données de trames audio ou vidéo

Publication

EP 1020997 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125875 A

Priority

  • EP 99125875 A
  • EP 99250009 A

Abstract (en)

For broadcasting purposes a multi-channel audio encoder board has been designed. Input time stamps (ITS) are generated which become linked at least in one input processing stage with frames of said audio data to be encoded, wherein the input time stamps or time stamps derived from the input time stamps remain linked with the correspondingly processed frame data (COE) in the different processing stages in the processing, but are at least in the last processing stage replaced by output time stamps. In each of theses stages the corresponding time stamp information linked with current frame data to be processed is regarded in order to control the overall delay of the processing. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/66; H04N 7/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/52 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1020997 A2 20000719; EP 1020997 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090327

2008-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04N 7/52 A, 7H 04B 1/66 B

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI