Global Patent Index - EP 1021062 A2

EP 1021062 A2 2000-07-19 - Method and apparatus for the reproduction of multi-channel audio signals

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the reproduction of multi-channel audio signals

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiedergabe von mehrkanaligen Audiosignalen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la reproduction de signaux audio multicanaux

Publication

EP 1021062 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00100054 A

Priority

DE 19900961 A

Abstract (en)

Virtual surround systems enable a spatial representation of audio signals merely using the front loudspeakers (SL, SR). In this case, the surround channels (C, Ls, Rs) are fed to the two front channels (L, R), the virtual surround effect being attained by these surround channels being processed beforehand. In particular in the case of static objects or objects which are only moving slowly, the quality of the acoustic reproduction by known virtual surround systems is, however, behind the quality in the case of a reproduction by a high-grade multi-channel audio system. According to the invention, it is possible to achieve an improvement in the acoustics by the virtual surround sources being moved. This can be done with constant periodicity or as a function of the amplitude of the front channel signals (L, R). If the virtual position of the surround loudspeakers (SLs, SRs) is specified by filtering of the rear channel signals (Ls, Rs), then this can be varied in particular by alteration of the filter parameters. Equally, however, this can be done exclusively or additionally by means of a different propagation delay, amplification or matrixing of the rear channel signals (Ls, Rs). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 5/02 (2006.01); H04S 1/00 (2006.01); H04S 3/00 (2006.01); H04S 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 3/00 (2013.01); H04S 2400/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1021062 A2 20000719; EP 1021062 A3 20030917; EP 1021062 B1 20121212; DE 19900961 A1 20000720; JP 2000228800 A 20000815

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130312

2014-01-09 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 60047685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130913

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20121212

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130312

2013-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20130913

2013-02-14 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 60047685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121215

2013-02-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 60047685

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130207

2012-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2012-12-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2010-02-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071011

2004-06-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI