Global Patent Index - EP 1021078 A1

EP 1021078 A1 2000-07-26 - HYDRAULIC THREE POINT HITCH

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC THREE POINT HITCH

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE DREIPUNKTKUPPLUNG

Title (fr)

ATTACHE HYDRAULIQUE A TROIS POINTS

Publication

EP 1021078 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98952181 A

Priority

  • US 9821288 W
  • US 94886497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9918768A1] A self-contained hydraulic three point hitch assembly (12) includes a plate (16); a pair of frame rail mounts (18, 19), a pair of strut mounts (20, 21), a pair of hydraulic actuator mounts (22, 23), and a pair of lifting arm mounts (24, 25) on the plate (16); a pair of lifting arms (26, 27), each pivotally attached to a lifting arm mount (24, 25); a pair of hydraulic actuators (28, 29) each interconnected between a hydraulic actuator mount (22, 23) and a lifting arm (26, 27); and a pair of struts (14, 15), each attached on one end to a strut mount (20, 21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01B 59/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01B 59/043 (2006.01); A01B 59/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01B 59/064 (2013.01); A01B 59/068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9918768 A1 19990422; AU 9794098 A 19990503; EP 1021078 A1 20000726; EP 1021078 A4 20010816; JP 2001519173 A 20011023; US 5975216 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030110

2001-08-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 01B 59/043 A, 7A 01B 59/048 B

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUCTOR, INC.

2000-12-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TRUCTOR, INC.

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000410

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE