Global Patent Index - EP 1021102 A1

EP 1021102 A1 2000-07-26 - FOOT SUPPORT DEVICE IN A SPORTS SHOE

Title (en)

FOOT SUPPORT DEVICE IN A SPORTS SHOE

Title (de)

FUSS-STüTZVORRICHTUNG IN EINEN SPORTSCHUH

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'APPUI D'UN PIED DANS UNE CHAUSSURE DE SPORT

Publication

EP 1021102 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941516 A

Priority

  • FR 9801716 W
  • FR 9710043 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766673A1] The invention concerns a device comprising in combination a suspension element (3) arranged in a zone acting as support to the distal end of the foot first metatarsal head (5) and a transverse suspension element (4), arranged in the medio-tarsal zone, enclosing the heel front part. The invention is useful for making shoe insoles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 7/22; A43B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/22 (2006.01); A43B 7/14 (2006.01); A43B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/1425 (2013.01); A43B 7/14 (2013.01); A43B 7/144 (2013.01); A43B 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905927A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766673 A1 19990205; FR 2766673 B1 19990903; AT 214558 T 20020415; CA 2296747 A1 19990211; CA 2296747 C 20070508; DE 69804336 D1 20020425; DE 69804336 T2 20021121; EP 1021102 A1 20000726; EP 1021102 B1 20020320; ES 2170520 T3 20020801; JP 2001511375 A 20010814; WO 9905927 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090801

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20090707

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170520 T3

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804336 20020425

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214558 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010711

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE