Global Patent Index - EP 1021192 A1

EP 1021192 A1 2000-07-26 - DEXAMETHASONE GEL

Title (en)

DEXAMETHASONE GEL

Title (de)

DEXAMETHASON-GEL

Title (fr)

GEL DE DEXAMETHASONE

Publication

EP 1021192 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954349 A

Priority

  • DE 19744113 A
  • EP 9806339 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19744113A1] An ophthalmological preparation in the form of a gel comprising dexamethasone, a gelling agent, optionally other additives and water is new.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/57; A61K 47/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/06 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/573 (2006.01); A61K 47/32 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/573 (2013.01); A61K 9/0048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917780A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19744113 A1 19990415; AR 017170 A1 20010822; AT 230601 T 20030115; BR 9812849 A 20000808; CA 2300806 A1 19990415; CA 2300806 C 20040203; CN 1142782 C 20040324; CN 1266369 A 20000913; DK 1021192 T3 20030505; EP 1021192 A1 20000726; EP 1021192 B1 20030108; ES 2191352 T3 20030901; HK 1030748 A1 20040903; HU 0003796 A2 20010428; HU 0003796 A3 20010528; HU 224986 B1 20060529; IL 135001 D0 20010520; JP 2001518510 A 20011016; JP 4156793 B2 20080924; KR 100392481 B1 20030723; MX PA00003363 A 20071207; PL 189727 B1 20050930; PL 341026 A1 20010326; WO 9917780 A1 19990415; WO 9917780 A8 20000127; ZA 9809066 B 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161007

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161007

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141005

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20141005

2015-06-24 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030400935

- Effective date: 20150505

2015-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 230601 T

- Effective date: 20141005

2015-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: DR. GERHARD MANN CHEM.-PHARM. FABRIK GMBH

- Free text: DR. GERHARD MANN CHEM.-PHARM. FABRIK GMBH#BRUNSBUETTELER DAMM 165-173#D-13581 BERLIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DR. GERHARD MANN CHEM.-PHARM. FABRIK GMBH#BRUNSBUETTELER DAMM 165-173#D-13581 BERLIN (DE)

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20031014

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191352 T3

2003-09-01 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-05-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400935

2003-04-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806884 P 20030213

2003-02-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230601 T 20030115

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000218

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE