Global Patent Index - EP 1021247 A1

EP 1021247 A1 2000-07-26 - CHOPPER

Title (en)

CHOPPER

Title (de)

WOLF

Title (fr)

HACHOIR

Publication

EP 1021247 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943809 A

Priority

  • DE 29718019 U
  • EP 9804793 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919069A1] The invention concerns a chopper used for chopping up, for example fresh or frozen meat. Said chopper is provided with a cutting device (5) capable of moving axially in the chopper (1) body, such that the forward stroke, and therefore the pressing zone, can be adapted to the corresponding material to be cut. For this purpose, said chopper comprises an intermediate part (21, 22) capable of being mounted removable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/302 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919069A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718019 U1 19990204; AT 212565 T 20020215; DK 1021247 T3 20020521; EP 1021247 A1 20000726; EP 1021247 B1 20020130; WO 9919069 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-08-22 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802982

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802982 20020314

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK

2002-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 212565 T 20020215

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK