Global Patent Index - EP 1021261 A1

EP 1021261 A1 2000-07-26 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SLABS IN DIFFERENT SIZES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SLABS IN DIFFERENT SIZES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BRAMMEN VERSCHIEDENER FORMATE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE BRAMES DE DIFFERENTS FORMATS

Publication

EP 1021261 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954186 A

Priority

  • DE 9802761 W
  • DE 19741131 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741131A1] The width of the narrow side walls of the mold is varied in a predetermined manner independently of their displacement into positions corresponding to the desired slab width. Each narrow side wall (31, 32) of the mold is made up of at least two wedge shaped parts (33, 34) which are slidable along one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914004A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741131 A1 19990318; DE 19741131 C2 20010628; AT 217821 T 20020615; AU 1142899 A 19990405; EP 1021261 A1 20000726; EP 1021261 B1 20020522; ES 2174503 T3 20021101; JP 2001516645 A 20011002; US 6382304 B1 20020507; WO 9914004 A1 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050911

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030912

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030911

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-09-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2174503 T3

2002-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020913

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020909

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020907

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020904

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020827

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804207 20020627

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217821 T 20020615

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL