Global Patent Index - EP 1021275 A1

EP 1021275 A1 2000-07-26 - ABRASIVE ARTICLES AND THEIR PREPARATIONS

Title (en)

ABRASIVE ARTICLES AND THEIR PREPARATIONS

Title (de)

SCHLEIFARTIKEL UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ARTICLES ABRASIFS ET LEURS PREPARATIONS

Publication

EP 1021275 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949487 A

Priority

  • GB 9721494 A
  • US 9820048 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919116A1] An abrasive article comprising an abrasive fabric comprising a fabric having discrete areas of electro-deposited metal extending on or therethrough and having abrasive material embedded in the metal, a layer of adhesive, and a backing substrate, the abrasive fabric being bonded to the backing substrate by the layer of adhesive, characterized in that either (i) the surface of the abrasive fabric bonded to the backing has been roughened and/or (ii) the layer of adhesive comprises an epoxy-acrylate thermosetting adhesive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 18/00; B24D 3/00; B24D 3/06; B24D 11/00; B24D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/00 (2006.01); B24D 3/06 (2006.01); B24D 11/00 (2006.01); B24D 11/02 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 18/0018 (2013.01); B24D 3/002 (2013.01); B24D 3/06 (2013.01); B24D 11/005 (2013.01); B24D 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919116A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919116 A1 19990422; CA 2303518 A1 19990422; DE 69807511 D1 20021002; DE 69807511 T2 20030515; EP 1021275 A1 20000726; EP 1021275 B1 20020828; GB 9721494 D0 19971210; JP 2001519250 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-09-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-09-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040915

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807511 20021002

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT