Global Patent Index - EP 1021283 A1

EP 1021283 A1 2000-07-26 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A WOOD COMPONENT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A WOOD COMPONENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BAUTEIL AUS HOLZ

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN PIECE EN BOIS

Publication

EP 1021283 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959732 A

Priority

  • DE 9803034 W
  • DE 19745706 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19745706A1] The wood construction component, with a geometric shape, has zones of different characteristics from hardened molten wood materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27K 5/00; B23K 26/00; B27K 5/06; B27M 1/00; B27M 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/00 (2014.01); B27K 5/00 (2006.01); B27K 5/06 (2006.01); B27M 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 1/06 (2013.01); B23K 26/0006 (2013.01); B27K 5/005 (2013.01); B27K 5/06 (2013.01); B23K 2203/30 (2015.10)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9920442A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19745706 A1 19990429; DE 19745706 B4 20050602; AU 1554999 A 19990510; CA 2306630 A1 19990429; EP 1021283 A1 20000726; WO 9920442 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080429

2007-05-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A WOOD COMPONENT

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITAET DRESDEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNISCHE UNIVERSITAET DRESDEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010906

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB LI SE