Global Patent Index - EP 1021302 A1

EP 1021302 A1 2000-07-26 - DROPLET DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF

Title (en)

DROPLET DEPOSITION APPARATUS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF

Title (de)

TRÖPFCHENAUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL UTILE POUR DEPOSER DES GOUTELETTES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1021302 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946612 A

Priority

  • GB 9803050 W
  • GB 9721555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919147A1] A piezoelectric printhead or other droplet deposition apparatus has parallel liquid containing channels defined by a base and displaceable walls, and covered by a cover number. The channels each have at least one nozzle for ejecting droplets. Each nozzle may be disposed in the base, the cover then having two ink supply parts spaced lengthwise of each channel on opposite sides of the nozzle. Alternatively two longitudinally spaced nozzles may be provided in the base of each channel. The cover may have a conductive track corrected to wall-displacing electrodes, the points of connection being outside the channels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1609 (2013.01); B41J 2/14209 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1634 (2013.01); B41J 2/1637 (2013.01); B41J 2/1643 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14387 (2013.01); B41J 2202/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919147A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919147 A1 19990422; AT 231073 T 20030215; AU 747616 B2 20020516; AU 9360898 A 19990503; BR 9812580 A 20020924; CA 2301819 A1 19990422; CA 2301819 C 20070724; CN 1146501 C 20040421; CN 1274316 A 20001122; DE 69810799 D1 20030220; DE 69810799 T2 20031023; DE 69833978 D1 20060518; DE 69833978 T2 20070125; EP 1021302 A1 20000726; EP 1021302 B1 20030115; EP 1241007 A1 20020918; EP 1241007 B1 20060329; ES 2186231 T3 20030501; ES 2257481 T3 20060801; GB 9721555 D0 19971210; IL 134657 A 20040104; IL 134657 D0 20010430; JP 2001519264 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151010

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151009

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151009

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-07-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151101

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151009

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69810799

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20141010

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-10-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-09-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186231 T3

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-02-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810799 P 20030220

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARVEY, ROBERT ALAN

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOMBARDI, GIUSEPPE

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OMER, SALHADIN

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TEMPLE, STEPHEN

2002-07-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XAAR TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE