Global Patent Index - EP 1021335 A1

EP 1021335 A1 2000-07-26 - POWDER FILLING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

POWDER FILLING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

PULVERFÜLLVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE POUR POUDRE

Publication

EP 1021335 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950964 A

Priority

  • US 9821059 W
  • US 94904797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9919215A1] The invention provides methods, systems and apparatus for the metered transport of fine powders into receptacles. According to one exemplary embodiment, an apparatus is provided which comprises a hopper (12) having an opening. The hopper is adapted to receive a bed of fine powder (20). At least one chamber (24), which is moveable to allow the chamber to be placed in close proximity to the opening, is also provided. An element (28) having a proximal end and a distal end is positioned within the hopper such that the distal end is near the opening. A vibrator motor is provided to vibrate the element when within the fine powder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 13/00 (2006.01); B65B 1/04 (2006.01); B65B 1/08 (2006.01); B65B 1/26 (2006.01); B65B 1/36 (2006.01); B65B 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919215A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9919215 A1 19990422; AR 015957 A1 20010530; AT 243638 T 20030715; AT 295299 T 20050515; AU 735627 B2 20010712; AU 9687398 A 19990503; BG 104198 A 20010131; BG 64618 B1 20050930; BR 9812893 A 20000808; CA 2306079 A1 19990422; CA 2306079 C 20071211; CN 1191963 C 20050309; CN 1273556 A 20001115; CO 4970755 A1 20001107; CU 22994 A3 20051220; CZ 20000756 A3 20010117; CZ 302824 B6 20111130; DE 69815874 D1 20030731; DE 69815874 T2 20040205; DE 69830208 D1 20050616; DE 69830208 T2 20060302; DE 69830208 T3 20100729; DK 1021335 T3 20031020; DK 1354795 T3 20050822; DK 1354795 T4 20100607; EA 001290 B1 20001225; EA 200000221 A1 20001030; EE 04424 B1 20050215; EE 200000223 A 20010416; EG 25495 A 20120122; EP 1021335 A1 20000726; EP 1021335 B1 20030625; EP 1354795 A2 20031022; EP 1354795 A3 20031029; EP 1354795 B1 20050511; EP 1354795 B2 20100224; ES 2201542 T3 20040316; ES 2242923 T3 20051116; ES 2242923 T5 20100528; GE P20033049 B 20030410; HK 1031363 A1 20041126; HR P20000200 A2 20011231; HR P20000200 B1 20041231; HU 0100018 A2 20010528; HU 0100018 A3 20010628; HU 224246 B1 20050628; ID 24623 A 20000727; IL 135534 A 20040725; IL 135534 D0 20010520; IS 2112 B 20060615; IS 5417 A 20000327; JP 2001519296 A 20011023; JP 2009160437 A 20090723; JP 4838332 B2 20111214; NO 20001806 A 20000607; NO 20001806 D0 20000407; NO 324158 B1 20070903; NZ 503153 A 20020531; PE 56799 A1 19990610; PL 193070 B1 20070131; PL 340002 A1 20010115; PT 1021335 E 20031031; PT 1354795 E 20050930; SI 1021335 T1 20031231; SI 1354795 T1 20051031; SI 1354795 T2 20100730; SK 286182 B6 20080506; SK 5012000 A3 20001211; TR 200000960 T2 20000821; TW 404920 B 20000911; UA 65591 C2 20001016; YU 17000 A 20010710; YU 49263 B 20041231; ZA 9809097 B 19990413

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161004

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161005

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161010

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161012

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161005

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160915

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS

- Free text: NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS#201 INDUSTRIAL ROAD#SAN CARLOS, CA 94070 (US) -TRANSFER TO- NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS#201 INDUSTRIAL ROAD#SAN CARLOS, CA 94070 (US)

2008-06-30 [REG SI SP73] CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER

- Owner name: NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS; US

- Effective date: 20080430

2007-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS; US

- Free text: NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS; 150 INDUSTRIAL ROAD; SAN CARLOS, CA 94070 (US) -TRANSFER TO- NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS; 201 INDUSTRIAL ROAD; SAN CARLOS, CA 94070 (US)

2007-11-14 [REG PT TE4A] CHANGE OF ADDRESS (PATENT)

- Owner name: NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS, US

- Effective date: 20071105

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-26 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031363

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201542 T3

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403594

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69815874 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010718

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOUT, GORDON

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PHAM, XUYEN

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROCCHIO, MICHAEL, J.

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAYDO, KYLE, A.

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PARKS, DERRICK, J.

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REICH, PATRICK

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000223;LT PAYMENT 20000223;LV PAYMENT 20000223;MK PAYMENT 20000223;RO PAYMENT 20000223;SI PAYMENT 20000223