Global Patent Index - EP 1021353 A1

EP 1021353 A1 2000-07-26 - METHOD FOR MARKING OBJECTS BY TRANSFER FROM A SLEEVE TUBE OF HEAT-SHRINKABLE PLASTIC MATERIAL WHICH IS SHRUNK ON THE OBJECT, AND SLEEVE TUBE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MARKING OBJECTS BY TRANSFER FROM A SLEEVE TUBE OF HEAT-SHRINKABLE PLASTIC MATERIAL WHICH IS SHRUNK ON THE OBJECT, AND SLEEVE TUBE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM MARKIEREN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN MITTELS EINER AUF DEN GEGENSTAND THERMOSCHRUMPFBAREN KUNSTSTOFFHÜLSE SOWIE HÜLSE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MARQUAGE D'OBJETS PAR TRANSFERT A PARTIR D'UN MANCHON EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE THERMORETRACTABLE QUI EST RETRACTE SUR L'OBJET, ET MANCHON DESTINE A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1021353 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97943036 A

Priority

  • FR 9701732 W
  • FR 9612182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2754248A1] The invention concerns a method for marking objects by transfer from a sleeve tube of heat-shrinkable plastic material which is shrunk on the object consisting in the following steps: setting on the internal face of a sleeve tube (20) a transferable element (30) of which the free face is coated with a dry heat activated adhesive film with a chip on it, then heating said sleeve tube (20) thus equipped and attached on the object for shrinking said sleeve tube and plate said element with its chip on the wall in line with the object, and activating the adhesive of the dry heat activated film so that the transferable element (30) adheres to the object (10) and urges the chip against the wall of said object. The invention also concerns a sleeve tube (20) specially designed for implementing said method, whereof the internal face comprises a transferable element (30) with a free face coated with a dry heat activated adhesive film with a chip on this film.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/08; B65C 3/06; G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/06 (2006.01); B65D 55/08 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/0854 (2013.01); B65C 3/065 (2013.01); G09F 3/0292 (2013.01); Y10S 206/807 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2817 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9815469A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2754248 A1 19980410; FR 2754248 B1 19981120; AT 204823 T 20010915; AU 4465897 A 19980505; BR 9712206 A 19990831; CA 2268349 A1 19980416; CA 2268349 C 20030520; DE 69706446 D1 20011004; DE 69706446 T2 20020516; EP 1021353 A1 20000726; EP 1021353 B1 20010829; ES 2163198 T3 20020116; PT 1021353 E 20020228; US 6113720 A 20000905; WO 9815469 A1 19980416

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081002

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081002

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SLEEVER INTERNATIONAL CY

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-04-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071010

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011113

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163198 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69706446 20011004

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT

2001-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 204823 T 20010915

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990324

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT