Global Patent Index - EP 1021355 B1

EP 1021355 B1 2002-09-18 - TWO-COMPONENT CONTAINER

Title (en)

TWO-COMPONENT CONTAINER

Title (de)

ZWEIKOMPONENTENBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

RESERVOIR A DEUX COMPOSANTES

Publication

EP 1021355 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936160 A

Priority

  • DE 19812657 A
  • EP 9900542 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812657A1] The invention relates to a two-component container (1). According to the invention, two chambers (6, 7) can be connected by expelling a sealing plug (5). The sealing plug (5), which has two stoppers (12, 13), can be pushed out of the elements (14, 15) holding it in place by screwing one container (3) into a thread (4) which is connected to another container (2). The two separate stoppers (12, 13) of the sealing plug (5) provide a reliable seal. As the container (3) is screwed in, the lower stopper (13) is expelled first by the upper stopper (12). The upper stopper (12) is then expelled by an expelling element (22). The inventive two-component container (1) is suitable for storing peroxide and hair colorant separately. After it has been expelled, the sealing plug (5) helps the two components to mix.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3211 (2013.01); Y10S 215/08 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3528525 A1 19870219 - GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812657 A1 19981224; AR 018148 A1 20011031; AU 3251399 A 19991018; AU 749648 B2 20020627; BR 9904882 A 20000919; EP 1021355 A1 20000726; EP 1021355 B1 20020918; ES 2184484 T3 20030401; ID 22245 A 19990923; JP 2002500604 A 20020108; JP 3875281 B2 20070131; KR 100625621 B1 20060920; KR 20010020113 A 20010315; US 6247586 B1 20010619; WO 9948771 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902737

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180116

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-05 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-10-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: WELLA GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-03-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: WELLA GMBH

- Effective date: 20120301

2011-08-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WELLA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WELLA AG, 64295 DARMSTADT, DE

- Document: DE 59902737

- Effective date: 20110629

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184484 T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902737 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990828

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT