Global patent index - EP 1021358 A1

EP 1021358 A1 2000-07-26 - THIN SHEET FOR CHEESE PRODUCTS MADE FROM ALUMINIUM FOIL OF REDUCED THICKNESS

Title (en)

THIN SHEET FOR CHEESE PRODUCTS MADE FROM ALUMINIUM FOIL OF REDUCED THICKNESS

Title (de)

ALUMINIUMFOLIE MIT VERRINGERTER DICKE FÜR KÄSEPRODUKTE

Title (fr)

FEUILLE MINCE POUR PRODUITS FROMAGERS A BASE DE FEUILLE D'ALUMINIUM D'EPAISSEUR REDUITE

Publication

EP 1021358 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97913239 A

Priority

  • FR 9701967 W
  • FR 9613708 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2755425A1] The invention concerns a thin sheet (1) for cheese products made of an aluminium foil (2) of not more than 12 mu m thick, coated with an external protective layer of lacquer (3) and an internal layer of heat-sealing varnish (4), characterised in that a) the aluminium foil (2) has a nominal thickness between 6 to 9 mu m, b) the external protective layer of lacquer (3) and/or said internal layer of varnish (4) contains a micronized filler (5, 51, 6) of content and size grading selected for controlling the rigidity and apparent thickness of said sheet (1) enabling its use on packaging machines adapted to the use of thin aluminium foil not exceeding 9 mu m in thickness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/76; B65D 65/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/42 (2006.01); B65D 85/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/42 (2013.01); B65D 85/76 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9819937A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2755425 A1 19980507; FR 2755425 B1 19990108; DE 69705869 D1 20010830; DE 69705869 T2 20020411; EG 21531 A 20011128; EP 1021358 A1 20000726; EP 1021358 B1 20010725; ES 2162264 T3 20011216; MA 24388 A1 19980701; PL 184948 B1 20030131; PL 333184 A1 19991122; TR 9900978 T2 19991021; WO 9819937 A1 19980514

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EUROPE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-11-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20040521

2005-05-11 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20040521

2002-09-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: VAW ALUMINIUM AG

2002-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: VAW ALUMINIUM AG

2002-06-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: VAW ALUMINIUM AG

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-06-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: VAW ALUMINIUM AG

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2162264

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-11-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2001-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69705869

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-30

2001-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL

2001-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990416

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL