Global Patent Index - EP 1021397 A4

EP 1021397 A4 2000-10-04 - BENZANTHRONE COMPOUNDS AND ANTIVIRAL USES THEREOF

Title (en)

BENZANTHRONE COMPOUNDS AND ANTIVIRAL USES THEREOF

Title (de)

BENZANTHRONVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE ANWENDUNG GEGEN VIREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES DE BENZOTHRONE ET SES UTILISATIONS ANTIVIRALES

Publication

EP 1021397 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98908887 A

Priority

  • US 9804140 W
  • US 3859797 P
  • US 3373898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839287A1] The present invention relates to benzanthrones and benzanthrone derivatives having antiviral properties and to antiviral compositions that include at least one benzanthrone or benzanthrone derivative having antiviral properties. Benzanthrones and benzanthrone derivatives having antiviral properties include 7H-benz[de]anthracen-7-ones, azabenzanthrones, and 7H-benz[de]anthracenes. In addition, the invention relates to a method for the treatment of viral infections with a pharmaceutical composition that includes at least one benzanthrone or benzanthrone derivative having antiviral properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/03; A61K 31/045; A61K 31/10; A61K 31/12; A61K 31/15; A61K 31/44; A61P 31/12; C07C 13/66; C07C 49/665; C07C 49/723; C07C 229/38; C07C 235/82; C07C 235/84; C07C 251/42; C07C 309/38; C07C 311/03; C07D 209/14; C07D 209/20; C07D 213/40; C07D 221/18; C07D 257/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/122 (2006.01); A61K 31/15 (2006.01); A61K 31/473 (2006.01); C07C 15/38 (2006.01); C07C 17/354 (2006.01); C07C 25/22 (2006.01); C07C 49/665 (2006.01); C07C 49/697 (2006.01); C07C 49/747 (2006.01); C07C 49/753 (2006.01); C07C 205/45 (2006.01); C07C 235/82 (2006.01); C07C 251/44 (2006.01); C07C 255/56 (2006.01); C07C 309/44 (2006.01); C07C 311/51 (2006.01); C07D 221/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 221/18 (2013.01); A61K 31/122 (2013.01); A61K 31/15 (2013.01); A61K 31/473 (2013.01); C07C 15/38 (2013.01); C07C 17/354 (2013.01); C07C 25/22 (2013.01); C07C 49/665 (2013.01); C07C 49/697 (2013.01); C07C 49/747 (2013.01); C07C 49/753 (2013.01); C07C 205/45 (2013.01); C07C 235/82 (2013.01); C07C 251/44 (2013.01); C07C 255/56 (2013.01); C07C 309/44 (2013.01); C07C 311/51 (2013.01); C07C 2603/40 (2017.05); C07C 2603/42 (2017.05)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 17/354 + C07C 25/22

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839287 A1 19980911; AR 012553 A1 20001108; AU 6680998 A 19980922; EP 1021397 A1 20000726; EP 1021397 A4 20001004

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2000-10-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/03 A, 7A 61K 31/045 B, 7A 61K 31/10 B, 7A 61K 31/12 B, 7A 61K 31/15 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61P 31/12 B, 7C 07C 13/66 B, 7C 07C 49/665 B, 7C 07C 49/723 B, 7C 07C 229/38 B, 7C 07C 235/82 B, 7C 07C 235/84 B, 7C 07C 251/42 B, 7C 07C 309/38 B, 7C 07C 311/03 B, 7C 07D 209/14 B, 7C 07D 209/20 B, 7C 07D 213/40 B, 7C 07D 221/18 B, 7C 07D 257/04 B

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE