Global Patent Index - EP 1021445 A4

EP 1021445 A4 2001-02-07 - CARBAPENEM ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SUCH COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT

Title (en)

CARBAPENEM ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SUCH COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT

Title (de)

ANTIBAKTERIELLE CARBAPENEM-VERBINDUNGEN, ZUBEREITUNGEN DIE SOLCHE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTEN UND BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ANTIBACTERIENNES DE CARBAPENEM, PREPARATIONS LES CONTENANT ET METHODES DE TRAITEMENT

Publication

EP 1021445 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97939843 A

Priority

  • GB 9624277 A
  • US 9715831 W
  • US 2618496 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811108A1] The present invention relates to carbapenem antibacterial agents in which the carbapenem nucleus is substituted at the 2-position with a sulfonamide containing ring system linked to the carbapenem nucleus through a CH2 group. The compounds are represented by formula (I) including pharmaceutically acceptable salts thereof, wherein: R<1> represents H or methyl; CO2M represents a carboxylic acid, a carboxylate anion, a pharmaceutically acceptable ester group or a carboxylic acid protected by a protecting group; P represents hydrogen, hydroxyl, F or hydroxyl protected by a hydroxyl-protecting group; X<1> and X<2> represent hydrogen or X<1> and X<2> taken together represent a carbonyl group; and one of AB, BC and CD represents a fused aryl, heteroaryl or heteroarylium ring, and the other variables represent R, said fused aryl, heteroaryl or heteroarylium ring being substituted with from 1-4 R groups. Pharmaceutical compositions and methods of use are also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 487/04; A61K 31/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/428 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/497 (2006.01); A61K 31/4995 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07D 477/14 (2006.01); C07D 519/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 477/14 (2013.01); Y02P 20/55 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] WO 9521841 A1 19950817 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [Y] EP 0463852 A2 19920102 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [Y] EP 0472306 A1 19920226 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [Y] WO 9428719 A1 19941222 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 9602548 A1 19960201 - MERCK & CO INC [US], et al
  • [Y] WADDELL S T ET AL: "Benzothiazolylthio Carbapenems: Potent Anti-MRSA Agents", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, vol. 5, no. 13, 6 July 1995 (1995-07-06), pages 1427 - 1432, XP004135463, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • [Y] GEORGOPAPADAKOU,N.: "Penicilin-Binding Proteins and Bacterial Resistance to beta-Lactams", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., vol. 37, no. 10, October 1993 (1993-10-01), DETROIT, pages 2045 - 2053, XP000944436
  • [T] WILKENING R R ET AL: "Synthesis and activity of 2-(sulfonamido)methyl-carbapenems: discovery of a novel, anti-MRSA 1,8-naphthosultam pharmacophore", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, vol. 9, no. 5, 8 March 1999 (1999-03-08), pages 673 - 678, XP004157592, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • [T] RATCLIFFE R W ET AL: "Synthesis and properties of 2-(naphthosultamyl)methyl-carbapenems with potent anti-mrsa activity: discovery of L-786,392", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, vol. 9, no. 5, 8 March 1999 (1999-03-08), pages 679 - 684, XP004157593, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • See also references of WO 9811108A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811108 A1 19980319; AU 4184497 A 19980402; CA 2264147 A1 19980319; EP 1021445 A1 20000726; EP 1021445 A4 20010207; JP 2001500862 A 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-02-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990412

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE