Global Patent Index - EP 1021458 A1

EP 1021458 A1 2000-07-26 - HELICOBACTER POLYPEPTIDES AND CORRESPONDING POLYNUCLEOTIDE MOLECULES

Title (en)

HELICOBACTER POLYPEPTIDES AND CORRESPONDING POLYNUCLEOTIDE MOLECULES

Title (de)

HELICOBACTER-POLYPEPTIDE UND ENTSPRECHENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDMOLEKÜLE

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDES HELICOBACTER ET MOLECULES DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES CORRESPONDANTES

Publication

EP 1021458 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97947620 A

Priority

  • US 9721353 W
  • US 74905196 A
  • US 83130997 A
  • US 83470597 A
  • US 83345797 A
  • US 88122797 A
  • US 90261597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821225A1] The invention provides Helicobacter polypeptides that can be used in vaccination methods for preventing or treating Helicobacter infection, and polynucleotides that encode these polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; A01N 37/18; A61K 39/02; C07K 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/205 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/121 (2013.01); C07K 14/205 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9821225 A1 19980522; AU 5266298 A 19980603; AU 735391 B2 20010705; CA 2271774 A1 19980522; EP 1021458 A1 20000726; EP 1021458 A4 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030811

2001-12-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12N 15/32 A, 7C 07K 14/205 B, 7C 07H 21/02 B, 7C 07K 1/00 B, 7A 61K 39/02 B, 7A 01N 37/18 B

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990614

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE