Global Patent Index - EP 1021458 A4

EP 1021458 A4 2001-12-12 - HELICOBACTER POLYPEPTIDES AND CORRESPONDING POLYNUCLEOTIDE MOLECULES

Title (en)

HELICOBACTER POLYPEPTIDES AND CORRESPONDING POLYNUCLEOTIDE MOLECULES

Title (de)

HELICOBACTER-POLYPEPTIDE UND ENTSPRECHENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDMOLEKÜLE

Title (fr)

POLYPEPTIDES HELICOBACTER ET MOLECULES DE POLYNUCLEOTIDES CORRESPONDANTES

Publication

EP 1021458 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97947620 A

Priority

  • US 9721353 W
  • US 74905196 A
  • US 83130997 A
  • US 83470597 A
  • US 83345797 A
  • US 88122797 A
  • US 90261597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821225A1] The invention provides Helicobacter polypeptides that can be used in vaccination methods for preventing or treating Helicobacter infection, and polynucleotides that encode these polypeptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/32; C07K 14/205; C07H 21/02; C07K 1/00; A61K 39/02; A01N 37/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/205 (2006.01); C07K 16/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/121 (2013.01); C07K 14/205 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); Y02A 50/472 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9610639 A2 19960411 - UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al
  • [X] CLAYTON C L ET AL: "MOLECULAR CLONING AND EXPRESSION OF CAMPYLOBACTER PYLORI SPECIES-SPECIFIC ANTIGENS IN ESCHERICHIA COLI K-12", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 57, no. 2, 1 February 1989 (1989-02-01), pages 623 - 629, XP000371704, ISSN: 0019-9567
  • [A] HEUERMANN D ET AL: "Genetic organization of a small cryptic plasmid of Helicobacter pylori", GENE, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 165, no. 1, 7 November 1995 (1995-11-07), pages 17 - 24, XP004043176, ISSN: 0378-1119
  • See also references of WO 9821225A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9821225 A1 19980522; AU 5266298 A 19980603; AU 735391 B2 20010705; CA 2271774 A1 19980522; EP 1021458 A1 20000726; EP 1021458 A4 20011212

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030811

2001-12-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011024

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12N 15/32 A, 7C 07K 14/205 B, 7C 07H 21/02 B, 7C 07K 1/00 B, 7A 61K 39/02 B, 7A 01N 37/18 B

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990614

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE