Global Patent Index - EP 1021499 A1

EP 1021499 A1 2000-07-26 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GASIFICATION OF SOLID CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GASIFICATION OF SOLID CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERGASUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEM FESTEN MATERIAL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE GAZEIFICATION DE MATIERES CARBONEES SOLIDES

Publication

EP 1021499 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958839 A

Priority

  • DK 9800541 W
  • DK 142397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932583A1] Gasification of solid carbonaceous material is performed in a circulating fluidised bed (CFB) gasifier which comprise a CFB reaction chamber (1), a particle separator (2) for separation of char-containing particles from the outlet gas (32) of the CFB reaction chamber, and a particle recirculation duct (5) for recirculation of the separated particles to the CFB-reaction chamber. The particle recirculation duct (5) comprises a char reaction chamber (3) for gasification of char contained in the recirculating particles. The function of the CFB gasifier may be controlled in different ways. Compared to the use of more traditional CFB gasifiers in which the char must be converted in the CFB reaction chamber, e.g. a cheaper and more compact construction, increased efficiency and increased fuel flexibility are achieved. The gasification process is well suited also for biofuels and waste products that have a high content of alkaline and chlorine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/56; F23C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/56 (2006.01); C10J 3/54 (2006.01); F23C 10/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/54 (2013.01); C10J 3/482 (2013.01); C10J 3/80 (2013.01); C10K 1/024 (2013.01); C10K 1/026 (2013.01); F23C 10/10 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0996 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1807 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1869 (2013.01); F23C 2206/101 (2013.01); F23C 2206/103 (2013.01); F23G 2201/40 (2013.01); F23G 2203/501 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932583A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV RO

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932583 A1 19990701; AU 1484399 A 19990712; DK 1021499 T3 20130729; EP 1021499 A1 20000726; EP 1021499 B1 20130417; EP 2284245 A1 20110216; ES 2424815 T3 20131008; PT 1021499 E 20130826

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161210

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161209

2017-08-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-08-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-07-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161209

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69843010

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151210

2017-01-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170127

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151209

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151209

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 607320 T

- Effective date: 20151209

2016-06-20 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150722

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141209

2015-09-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-09-03 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20130401473

- Effective date: 20150722

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20141209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141226

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69843010

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20131223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-08 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2424815 T3

- Effective date: 20131008

2013-10-01 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20130401473

- Effective date: 20130829

2013-09-25 [REG LT MG9D] INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

2013-08-26 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI, CH

2013-08-14 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2013-08-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2013-07-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2013-06-13 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69843010

- Effective date: 20130613

2013-05-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 607320 T

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-05-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2013-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2013-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV RO

2013-04-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2013-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PYRONEER A/S

2011-09-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10J 3/56 20060101AFI20110816BHEP

2010-02-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DONG ENERGY POWER A/S

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020812

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000322;LV PAYMENT 20000322;RO PAYMENT 20000322