Global Patent Index - EP 1021507 A1

EP 1021507 A1 2000-07-26 - CLEANING FORMULATION, ADDITIVE FOR A CLEANING FORMULATION AND PROCESS FOR CLEANING BOTTLES USING SUCH

Title (en)

CLEANING FORMULATION, ADDITIVE FOR A CLEANING FORMULATION AND PROCESS FOR CLEANING BOTTLES USING SUCH

Title (de)

REINIGINGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG ODER ZUSATZ DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN UM DAMIT FLASCHEN ZU REINIGEN

Title (fr)

FORMULATION DE NETTOYAGE, ADDITIF DESTINE A CETTE FORMULATION ET PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DE BOUTEILLES A L'AIDE DE CELLE-CI

Publication

EP 1021507 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 96939039 A

Priority

  • EP 96939039 A
  • EP 9604992 W
  • EP 95203158 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9719157A1] The present invention concerns an additive for a cleaning formulation, a cleaning formulation comprising this additive, and a process for cleaning bottles, in particular returnable PET bottles, using such, wherein the additive for the bottle washing formulation, for PET bottles, comprises: a polyacrylate; a polyhydroxy carboxylic acid of the general formula HOCH2- (CHOH)n-CO2H, wherein n = 2-8, and/or soluble salts thereof; and/or a wetting agent of the general formula R1 - (OC2H4)n - (OC3H8)m - OR2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/20; C11D 1/72; C11D 1/722

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/722 (2013.01); C11D 1/721 (2013.01); C11D 1/8255 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9719157A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9719157 A1 19970529; AU 716488 B2 20000224; AU 7624596 A 19970611; BR 9611595 A 19990406; CA 2236209 A1 19970529; CA 2236209 C 20050614; DE 69630407 D1 20031120; DE 69630407 T2 20040819; EP 1021507 A1 20000726; EP 1021507 B1 20031015; ES 2208765 T3 20040616; JP 2000501129 A 20000202; JP 4361605 B2 20091111; TR 9800875 T2 19980821; ZA 9609615 B 19980515

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69630407

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101114

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091114

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091113

2011-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110330

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091113

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091113

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208765 T3

2004-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69630407 P 20031120

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/20 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/72 B

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/722 B

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/37 B

2003-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF CLEANING FORMULATION AND PROCESS FOR CLEANING BOTTLES

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSONDIVERSEY, INC.

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE