Global Patent Index - EP 1021588 A4

EP 1021588 A4 2002-11-06 - FLUID DELIVERY APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

FLUID DELIVERY APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

ANLAGE UND VERFAHRENZUR FLÜSSIGKEITSZULIEFERUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ADMINISTRATION DE FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1021588 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98934511 A

Priority

  • US 9814525 W
  • US 5244297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904060A1] A fluid delivery apparatus and method for metering and delivering a fluid to a downstream process. The fluid delivery apparatus includes a vessel (12) containing a fluid to be dispensed and a barrier member (16), wherein the barrier member (16) is translatable against the liquid (14). A method for metering and delivering a fluid to a downstream process includes confining the fluid in a vessel (12) having a barrier member (16) and selectively imposing a force on the barrier member (16) to cause the fluid to flow from the vessel (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 4/00 (2006.01); C23C 16/448 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 4/001 (2013.01); C23C 16/448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9421840 A1 19940929 - ADVANCED TECH MATERIALS [US], et al
  • [X] EP 0622475 A1 19941102 - APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 412 (C - 0755) 6 September 1990 (1990-09-06) & DATABASE WPI Derwent World Patents Index; AN 1990-228065DATABASE WPI1Derwent World Patents Index1990-228065
  • See also references of WO 9904060A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904060 A1 19990128; AU 8401698 A 19990210; EP 1021588 A1 20000726; EP 1021588 A4 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000118

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE